U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GALES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2022: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 01, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.