U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00649-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DICKINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Error]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • December 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 07, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.