U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00642-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TUNIS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 17, 2021: [Bond ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 15, 2021: [Review]
  • November 15, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.