U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00652-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUNSTRUM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Review]
  • February 15, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.