U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00651-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPAIN, JR.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Protective Order ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.