U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00638-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PORTLOCK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 13, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • February 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Exclude]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 10, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.