U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-17511-
  • Case Name: Aura Cano
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Close Bankruptcy Case with Final Decree [Ch 7 No Asset]]
  • August 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Auto Discharge of Debtor(s) [Ch 7]]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
  • June 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
  • June 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • June 06, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Certification of Financial Management Course (ADI)]
  • June 03, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Payment Advices]
  • May 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • May 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form 122A-1 [Ch 7]]
  • May 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 31, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 26, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 26, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto]]
  • May 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.