open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cv-01186
    Party Name:Bacon, Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - Social Security]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social security transcript]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of time to answer]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proof of service]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons returned executed as to USA]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons issued as to USA]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Related case order and track 1 notice]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SS Standing Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?363946
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =