open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:19-cr-20324-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera Berrios
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance & Arraignment (WITH OPTIONAL SDO)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?550603
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =