open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:19-cr-20351-2
    Party Name:USA v. Chacin Haddad et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Bond]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disbursement of Bond]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Distribution of Bond]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Release Bond Obligation]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release Bond Obligation]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or Sentencing]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Select as last hrg for OPT SDO txt)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?551491
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =