open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:19-cv-23770
    Party Name:Technolojoy, LLC et al v. BHPH Consulting Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?557132
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =