open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00398-1
    Party Name:USA v. Lauro
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to continue trial]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial discovery order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to appoint counsel]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?368442
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =