open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:18-cr-20783-1
    Party Name:USA v. Fornieles
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Downward Departure]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment/Report Re: Counsel Hearing]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Select as last hrg for OPT SDO txt)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?536075
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =