open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:19-cr-00201-1
    Party Name:USA v. Morlen
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Acquittal]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine ]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed verdict form filed]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine ]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations concerning plea of guilty]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of no objection to report and recommendation]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Inspection of PSI]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice re: guilty plea]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of maximum penalty]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of estimated length of trial by USA]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to continue trial]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of unavailability]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing (time only)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?368474
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =