open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:19-bk-08024-KJ
    Party Name:Ismael Hernandez, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond & Closing Estate (incl. Conditional)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [Discharge Of Debtor - Ch. 7 - TAMPA/ORLANDO/JAX]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds (No Paper)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [COURT - Notice Of Reassignment of Case (batch)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton, Lori [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1298764
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =