open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:19-bk-04593-
    Party Name:Gig Young and Marilyn F Young
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Extend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Motion to Extend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Order Directing Debtor/Attorney/Others]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [TRUSTEE - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice Of Requirement to File a Certification About a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [(NO PAPER) - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [(NO PAPER) - Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Mortgage Modification Mediation Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Motion for Referral to Mortgage Modification Mediation]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Summary of Assets]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement of Current Monthly Income / Calculation of Disposable Income - Ch 13 (B122C-1 / B22C-2)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Order Scheduling (Including BK Trial Matters)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 13]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice Of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1298548
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =