open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-26408-
    Party Name:Pedro R Castillo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Trustee's Request for Order Confirming Plan [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Objection to Claims Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Order Authorizing Ch 13 Trustee to Disburse Payments]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Continued Hearing]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Hearing by Filer]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Objection to Claim(s)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF]]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Compliance with Claims Review]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice to Debtor of Additional Creditors]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Financial Management Course (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Compliance and Request for Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?759778
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =