open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-26405-
    Party Name:Liliam Franco
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Auto Discharge of Debtor(s) [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:March 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Notice of Requirement to File a Certificate of Completion of a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form 122A-1 [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto]]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Calderin, Jacqueline [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?759775
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =