open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:20-cr-00033-1
    Party Name:USA v. Larenas
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [*Remark]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change Venue / Transfer Case]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Passport - Surrender or Return]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to counsel re: sentencing]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of plea]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of no objection to report and recommendation]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations Concerning Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Inspection of PSI]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice re: guilty plea]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of waiver of indictment]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Personal Recognizance Release Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?374309
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =