open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:20-cr-00069-1
    Party Name:USA v. Perez Castillo et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent regarding entry of plea]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to institute presentence investigation report]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Interpreter]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Interpreter]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing (courtroom only)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations Concerning Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent re Plea by Video and PSI]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice canceling hearing]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial discovery order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?374286
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =