open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:20-bk-04470-
    Party Name:Mohammed J Alawi and Samira Alawi
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds (No Paper)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Noble, Emerson C [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1313730
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =