open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:20-bk-04471-
    Party Name:Christian Javier Andino
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds (No Paper)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Certificate of Completion of Financial Management Course (or) Certificate of Debtor Education]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1313732
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =