open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:20-bk-06042-
    Party Name:Hisham Ali Mouzanner and Mariana Mirella Mouzanner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [(NO PAPER) - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1313733
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =