U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12716-
  • Case Name: Nicole Santos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Notice of Hearing by Filer]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Deficiency for Confirmation [Batch]]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Deficiency for Confirmation [Batch]]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certificate of Service of Trustee's Notice of Required Documents [Batch]]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certification of Compliance and Request for Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Payment Advices]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.