U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00798-
  • Case Name: Alexander Vlad Cherednichenko and Irina Olegovna Cherednichenko
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scharrer, Beth Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.