U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-02595-
  • Case Name: Michelle Brynn McGuirk
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.