U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-bk-02852-
  • Case Name: Reef Pools, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Request for Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Request for Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Equity Security Holders]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Chapter 11 Case Management Summary]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Case Management Summary]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Mueller, Ruediger [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.