U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-14962
  • Case Name: Alberto Hernandez Villavicencio
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Certification of Financial Management Course (ADI)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Request for Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Payment Advices]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF]]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto]]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form 122A-1 [Ch 7]]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dunn, Marcia T [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.