U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-bk-02866-
  • Case Name: Alicia Monique Hill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Summary of Assets]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Statement of Intentions]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Statement of Current Monthly Income / Means Test Calculation - Chapter 7 (B122A-1 / B122A-2)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchise, Douglas N [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.