U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-02604-
  • Case Name: Sara Maria Smythe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Pro Bono Representation of Debtor]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.