U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30389
  • Case Name: Lisa Lynn Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Request for Notices (Not Attorney Appearance)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Repeat Filer]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of Pro Bono & Bankruptcy Resources (PDF/Form)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order Establishing Duties of the Debtor (Ch 13) (Form)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order to Show Cause re Matrix Deficiency (PDF / Form)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order to Show Cause re Old Official Forms (PDF/Form)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of 341(a) Meeting and Initial Confirmation Hearing - Ch 13]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Documents Provided to Debtor or Non-Electronic Filer (PDF/Form/Paperless)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Documents Provided to Debtor or Non-Electronic Filer (PDF/Form/Paperless)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.