U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10104
  • Case Name: Israel J Mujica Pastor and Sharelis Villanueva Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Financial Management Course Certificate (filed by Provider)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of Compliance with Sec. 521(a)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Enter Individual Creditor(s) (Paperless)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Employee Income Records - Payment Advices OR Stmt/Cert of No Employment Income]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order Establishing Duties of the Debtor (Ch 13) (Form)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of 341(a) Meeting and Initial Confirmation Hearing - Ch 13]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.