U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-14970
  • Case Name: Anciom, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Employ]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Use Cash Collateral Order]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Notice of Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Chapter 11 Small Business Cash Flow Statement]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Statement of Operations]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Order Continuing Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Meeting of Creditors 11]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Case Management Summary]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [UST Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Tax Return Documents]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Tax Return Documents]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Employ]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Leali, Linda Marie [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.