U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-14965-
  • Case Name: Christopher R Viso
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information Order]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Order (Generic)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Notice of Pro Bono Resources]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Extend Time to File Schedules / Plan / Required Information]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto]]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mukamal, Barry E [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [OTC]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.