U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-14976-
  • Case Name: Hesham Amirghamy Elsarif
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certification of Compliance and Request for Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Extend or Impose Automatic Stay]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Payment Advices]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Request for Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certificate of Service of Trustee's Notice of Required Documents [Batch]]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.