U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-01454-
  • Case Name: Richard Neal Lowman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Ch. 12 or Ch. 13 Plan]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [AJTA - Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [ADI - Administrative Order FLMB-2018-2 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.