U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-01432-
  • Case Name: Teco Kaelin Gervasini
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Statement of Intentions]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Statement of Current Monthly Income / Means Test Calculation - Chapter 7 (B122A-1 / B122A-2)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Pro Bono Representation of Debtor]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.