U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05006-
  • Case Name: Wilson v. United States Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons - Service Executed]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Send Document to BNC]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • May 04, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 03, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Initial Scheduling Order in AP (PDF / Form)]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Certificate of Service/Mailing (PDF or Paperless)]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Send Summons to BNC for Service to Pro Se Litigant]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued (incl Corrected, Alias & Third-party) (PDF/Form)]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Corrective Entry w/Checklist]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Refiling Required (Paperless/Pro se Form/PDF)]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint (Open New AP)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.