U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-14997-
  • Case Name: Lenin V. Ramirez Sosa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Order Dismissing Case (Deficiencies)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certificate of Service of Trustee's Notice of Required Documents [Batch]]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Notice of Pro Bono Resources]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments Order]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Photo ID Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [OTC]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.