U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-14996
  • Case Name: Orlando Acevedo, Jr. and Jessica Acevedo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Relief from Stay]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Hearing by Filer]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Compliance and Request for Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Payment Advices]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.