U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-02637
  • Case Name: Claudio Dominguez Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Notice of Change of Address - Party]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Request for Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Pro Bono Representation of Debtor]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice and Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice and Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mahendru, Arvind [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.