U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-bk-02882-
  • Case Name: Gregory Wooten Freeland and Wendy Lee Freeland
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Certificate Of Service (BK)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Pro Bono Representation of Debtor]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [AJTA - Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [ADI - Administrative Order FLMB-2018-2 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice and Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.