U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-15006-
  • Case Name: Gabriel J Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Payment Advices]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certification of Compliance and Request for Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certificate of Service of Trustee's Notice of Required Documents [Batch]]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.