U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-bk-02897-
  • Case Name: Scott Thomas Martin and Kimberly Irene Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Chaney, Carolyn R. [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.