U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-00349-
  • Case Name: Kenan Karincic
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [Delay Discharge]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [Virtual Order Vacating Order (TEXT ONLY)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [Delay Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jones, Gordon P. [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.