U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-02658-
  • Case Name: Matthew Thomas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Tax Documents]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Indiv. w/Claim Deadline]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Request for Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Chapter 11 Case Management Summary]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.