U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-02651-
  • Case Name: Raul Ignacio Briceno
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [AJTA - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case No Proof of Claim Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webber, Richard B [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.