U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40200
  • Case Name: Christopher Scott Galati and Lisa Marie Jackubowski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Response to]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Service by CM/ECF Notice of Electronic Filing (Paperless)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Service/Mailing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Pre-Confirmation Statement]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Clerk's Notice of Compliance (Paperless)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Service Related (Paperless/PDF/Pro se Form)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient docs)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Service/Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Clerk's Notice re Mtn to Impose/Extend Automatic Stay (Paperless)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Hearing SET: Evid Hrg re Mtn to Impose/Extend Stay (PDF/Form)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Repeat Filer]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order Establishing Duties of the Debtor (Ch 13) (Form)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of 341(a) Meeting and Initial Confirmation Hearing - Ch 13]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Employee Income Records - Payment Advices OR Stmt/Cert of No Employment Income]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records - Payment Advices OR Stmt/Cert of No Employment Income]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.