U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-15015-
  • Case Name: Ocean Five Condominium Association, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [Order Granting (TEXT ONLY)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [Appear Remotely (Ex Parte)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [Meeting of Creditors 11]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [UST Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Fox, Carol Lynn [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Unavailability [Attorney]]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF]]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Tax Return Documents]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Small Business - All Financial Documents]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deficiency]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.