U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-15028-
  • Case Name: Silverstone Southeast Investment LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors 11]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [OTC]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.